NY A05623 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.301
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.301
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unfair claim settlement practices; provides that plaintiff may recover interest, costs and disbursements; compensatory damages, consequential damages and reasonable attorneys' fees in addition to amounts due under the policy when the insurer refused to pay or unreasonable delay of payment was not reasonably justified.
Title
Relates to unfair claim settlement practices; provides that plaintiff may recover interest, costs and disbursements; compensatory damages, consequential damages and reasonable attorneys' fees in addition to amounts due under the policy when the insurer refused to pay or unreasonable delay of payment was not reasonably justified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.301 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.301 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | print number 5623b |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | print number 5623a |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06216 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - PRINT NUMBER 6216A