NY A05621 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to court ordered forensic evaluations and reports in child custody and visitation proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to court ordered forensic evaluations and reports in child custody and visitation proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.198
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-14Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04686 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback