NY A05618 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - substituted by s1040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defines "victim of domestic violence"; prohibits employers from discriminating against victims of domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defines "victim of domestic violence"; prohibits employers from discriminating against victims of domestic violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14Assemblysubstituted by s1040
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.300
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-14Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01040 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback