NY A05618 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to reimbursement methodologies for tuition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to reimbursement methodologies for tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatetabled
2018-12-21Senatevetoed memo.301
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.2002
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4530A
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.274
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.274
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-07Assemblyprint number 5618a
2018-06-07Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to education
2017-02-13Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S04530 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5618A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05618&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05618&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05618
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05618&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05618A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05618&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05618&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05618&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A5618#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05618&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback