NY A05604 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain technical amendments to the estates, powers and trusts law and the surrogate's court procedure act to reflect the provisions of the marriage equality act.
Title
Makes certain technical amendments to the estates, powers and trusts law and the surrogate's court procedure act to reflect the provisions of the marriage equality act.
Sponsors
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.420 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.88 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | substituted for a5604 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.58 |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | substituted by s300 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.88 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00300 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.420