NY A05582 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-14 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-14 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain persons attend the electronic cigarette and vaping prevention, awareness and control program.
Title
Requires certain persons attend the electronic cigarette and vaping prevention, awareness and control program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in health |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | print number 5582a |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | referred to health |