NY A05576 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1144a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1144a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the standard of evidence and certain other procedures when determining whether to revoke the community supervision of a person.
Title
Modifies the standard of evidence and certain other procedures when determining whether to revoke the community supervision of a person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s1144a |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.710 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.710 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | print number 5576a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01144 (Same As) 2021-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.427