NY A05575 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of MWBE investments for and aspirational goal of at least twenty percent of each New York state fund, to the greatest extent feasible within the bounds of financial and fiduciary prudence.
Title
Relates to the use of MWBE investments for and aspirational goal of at least twenty percent of each New York state fund, to the greatest extent feasible within the bounds of financial and fiduciary prudence.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Amanda Septimo [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reference changed to governmental employees |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03267 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS