NY A05565 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - signed chap.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes certain wholesalers authorized to sell beer at retail for off premises consumption to also sell certain grocery items.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certain wholesalers authorized to sell beer at retail for off premises consumption to also sell certain grocery items.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-25Senatesigned chap.505
2012-12-28Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1410
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5404A
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.289
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.289
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-08Assemblyprint number 5565a
2012-06-08Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2012-03-13Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to economic development
2011-02-23Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S00606 (Same As) 2011-05-04 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05404 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5565A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback