NY A05549 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s2630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s2630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certificates of relief from disabilities and certificates of good conduct upon discharge.
Title
Relates to certificates of relief from disabilities and certificates of good conduct upon discharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s2630 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.563 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.563 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02630 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.491