NY A05546 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for enhanced enforcement of the warranty of habitability for housing accommodations; provides the court may award punitive damages to a tenant upon finding the landlord's breach of warranty was intentional and malicious.
Title
Provides for enhanced enforcement of the warranty of habitability for housing accommodations; provides the court may award punitive damages to a tenant upon finding the landlord's breach of warranty was intentional and malicious.
Sponsors
Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | print number 5546a |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05070 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY