NY A05540 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - held for consideration in social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - held for consideration in social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring participation in education programs leading to a high school diploma or high school equivalency diploma for those seeking public assistance.
Title
Relates to requiring participation in education programs leading to a high school diploma or high school equivalency diploma for those seeking public assistance.
Sponsors
Asm. Andrew Goodell [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Christopher Friend [R] |
Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in social services |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01034 (Same As) 2019-01-10 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES