NY A05539 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a review process of proposals to alienate municipal parkland.
Title
Provides for a review process of proposals to alienate municipal parkland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-02-28 | Assembly | reference changed to local governments |
2011-02-23 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01916 (Same As) 2012-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 1916A