NY A05532 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a corporate franchise tax check-off and a personal income tax check-off for taxpayer gifts for diabetes research and education; establishes the diabetes research and education fund.
Title
Provides for a corporate franchise tax check-off and a personal income tax check-off for taxpayer gifts for diabetes research and education; establishes the diabetes research and education fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5532a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.177 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.440 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05088 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5088A