NY A05531 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - amended on third reading 5531a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - amended on third reading 5531a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes voting by proxy at a judicial district convention due to novel coronavirus, COVID-19.
Title
Authorizes voting by proxy at a judicial district convention due to novel coronavirus, COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5531a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.176 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.189 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.189 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06854 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS