NY A05527 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - signed chap.449
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - signed chap.449
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring counselors to have certain courses of study or equivalent on-the-job experience including on providing trauma-informed, patient-centered care, referring individuals to appropriate treatments for co-occurring disorders, and sensitivity training.
Title
Relates to requiring counselors to have certain courses of study or equivalent on-the-job experience including on providing trauma-informed, patient-centered care, referring individuals to appropriate treatments for co-occurring disorders, and sensitivity training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Assembly | signed chap.449 |
2021-09-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.89 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S361A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.121 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.121 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 5527a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S00361 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5527A