NY A05523 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a suspending authority to condition the early return of a student on such student's voluntary participation in counseling or specialized classes, including anger management or dispute resolution, where applicable.
Title
Allows a suspending authority to condition the early return of a student on such student's voluntary participation in counseling or specialized classes, including anger management or dispute resolution, where applicable.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] |
Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.154 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.115 |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | referred to education |