NY A05523 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for members of a public pension or retirement system, accrued benefits shall not be diminished or impaired except as authorized and prescribed by the legislature.
Title
Provides that for members of a public pension or retirement system, accrued benefits shall not be diminished or impaired except as authorized and prescribed by the legislature.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R] | Asm. John Salka [R] | Asm. Christopher Tague [R] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |