NY A05518 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - print number 5518a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - print number 5518a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the coverage to include cancer of the lymphatic or hematological systems, the digestive, urinary, prostate, neurological, breast or reproductive systems or melanoma.
Title
Expands the coverage to include cancer of the lymphatic or hematological systems, the digestive, urinary, prostate, neurological, breast or reproductive systems or melanoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Assembly | print number 5518a |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03891 (Same As) 2016-04-11 - referred to local governments
S08065 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - referred to local governments
S08065 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - referred to local governments