NY A05514 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to central venous lines; requires hospitals upon discharge of a patient who has a condition that requires a central venous line after discharge, to consult with the designated caregiver to determine his or her capabilities and limitations.
Title
Relates to central venous lines; requires hospitals upon discharge of a patient who has a condition that requires a central venous line after discharge, to consult with the designated caregiver to determine his or her capabilities and limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5514c |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.714 |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | print number 5514b |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | print number 5514a |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01165 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 1165B