NY A05505 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Community Violence Intervention and Prevention Act; provides findings for evidence-based and evidence-informed health programs from hospital-based and community-based programs.
Title
Establishes the Community Violence Intervention and Prevention Act; provides findings for evidence-based and evidence-informed health programs from hospital-based and community-based programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | print number 5505a |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01049 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION