NY A05499 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of health to conduct a study and issue a report examining the unmet health and resource needs facing pregnant women in New York and the impact of limited service pregnancy centers on the ability of women to obtain accurate, non-coercive health care information and timely access to a comprehensive range of reproductive and sexual health care services.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of health to conduct a study and issue a report examining the unmet health and resource needs facing pregnant women in New York and the impact of limited service pregnancy centers on the ability of women to obtain accurate, non-coercive health care information and timely access to a comprehensive range of reproductive and sexual health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Assembly | signed chap.217 |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1620 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S470 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.174 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.329 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.329 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00470 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5499