NY A05499 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - print number 5499b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the licensure of athletic trainers; adds athletic trainers to the list of persons and officials required to report cases of suspected child abuse or maltreatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the licensure of athletic trainers; adds athletic trainers to the list of persons and officials required to report cases of suspected child abuse or maltreatment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11Assemblyprint number 5499b
2020-05-11Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to higher education
2019-07-08Assemblyprint number 5499a
2019-07-08Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2019-02-12Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S05127 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5127A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback