NY A05494 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-22)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s3419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the right of adoptees to receive a certified copy of their birth certificate upon reaching the age of 18, or if the adopted person is deceased, the adopted person's direct line descendants, or the lawful representative of such adopted person, or lawful representatives of such deceased adopted person's direct line descendants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the right of adoptees to receive a certified copy of their birth certificate upon reaching the age of 18, or if the adopted person is deceased, the adopted person's direct line descendants, or the lawful representative of such adopted person, or lawful representatives of such deceased adopted person's direct line descendants.

Sponsors

Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Mark Johns [R]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]
Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Robin Schimminger [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Doug Smith [R]
Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]
Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Brian Manktelow [R]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. John Salka [R]Asm. Michael Reilly [R]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Mark Walczyk [R]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Taylor Raynor [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Brian Kolb [R]
Asm. Kieran Lalor [R]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]
Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Anthony Palumbo [R]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Daniel Stec [R]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s3419
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.642
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-12Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03419 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback