NY A05489 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s210b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s210b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to develop an informational pamphlet for patients undergoing pelvic examinations and to make the informational pamphlet available for use by medical practitioners performing pelvic examinations; requires medical practitioners performing pelvic exams to disseminate such pamphlets.
Title
Requires the department of health to develop an informational pamphlet for patients undergoing pelvic examinations and to make the informational pamphlet available for use by medical practitioners performing pelvic examinations; requires medical practitioners performing pelvic exams to disseminate such pamphlets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s210b |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.561 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 5489b |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | print number 5489a |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00210 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.272