NY A05483 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain findings and determinations with respect to certain bond anticipation notes issued by the city school district of the city of Binghamton, and authorizes the issuance of obligations of such school district with respect thereto; authorizes certain bond anticipation notes to be renewed and the maturity thereof, including the maturity of renewals thereof, to extend for a period not to exceed seven years beyond the respective original date of issue of such bond anticipation notes.
Title
Makes certain findings and determinations with respect to certain bond anticipation notes issued by the city school district of the city of Binghamton, and authorizes the issuance of obligations of such school district with respect thereto; authorizes certain bond anticipation notes to be renewed and the maturity thereof, including the maturity of renewals thereof, to extend for a period not to exceed seven years beyond the respective original date of issue of such bond anticipation notes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.317 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.267 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a5483a |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1335 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 2459A |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2459a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.267 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.267 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | print number 5483a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02459 (Same As) 2019-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.317