NY A05475 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a taxpayer to elect to contribute a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Title
Allows a taxpayer to elect to contribute a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5475a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.214 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.116 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.116 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03890 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS