NY A05470 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - approval memo.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - approval memo.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a particularized and specific justification for denial of access to records under the freedom of information law; relates to exemption from disclosure under the freedom of information law of certain law enforcement related records and records identifying victims.
Title
Requires a particularized and specific justification for denial of access to records under the freedom of information law; relates to exemption from disclosure under the freedom of information law of certain law enforcement related records and records identifying victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Assembly | approval memo.157 |
2021-12-29 | Assembly | signed chap.808 |
2021-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.679 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6017 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.148 |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06017 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5470