NY A05468 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of voice recognition features on certain products.
Title
Relates to the use of voice recognition features on certain products.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.153 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.701 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.701 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | print number 5468a |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01298 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION