NY A05459 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes credit unions to participate in the excelsior linked deposit program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes credit unions to participate in the excelsior linked deposit program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03Assemblysubstituted by s191
2021-06-02Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.326
2021-06-02Assemblyrules report cal.326
2021-06-02Assemblyreported
2021-05-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-03-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-02-16Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S00191 (Same As) 2021-10-24 - SIGNED CHAP.495

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback