NY A05458 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - amended on third reading 5458b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - amended on third reading 5458b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits municipal officers or employees from displaying political advertisements on or within public buildings and various other locations.
Title
Prohibits municipal officers or employees from displaying political advertisements on or within public buildings and various other locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5458b |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 5458a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.170 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.188 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.188 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04539 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - referred to local governments