NY A05438 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes gambling on professional sporting events and athletic events sponsored by universities or colleges at betting facilities located at thoroughbred and harness racetracks operating in this state, in simulcast theaters operated by off-track betting corporations and in any constitutionally authorized casino facility; provides that the proceeds of such gambling be applied exclusively to or in aid or support of education.
Title
Authorizes gambling on professional sporting events and athletic events sponsored by universities or colleges at betting facilities located at thoroughbred and harness racetracks operating in this state, in simulcast theaters operated by off-track betting corporations and in any constitutionally authorized casino facility; provides that the proceeds of such gambling be applied exclusively to or in aid or support of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S01282 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 1282A