NY A05436 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - substituted by s612b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - substituted by s612b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of the state long-term care ombudsman to advertise and promote the long-term care ombudsman program (Part A); directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the state long-term care ombudsman and the commissioners of the departments responsible for the license or certification of long-term care facilities, to establish policies and procedures for reporting, by staff and volunteers of the long-term care ombudsman program, issues concerning the health, safety and welfare of residents at long-term care facilities (Part B); includes access to state long-term care ombudsman program staff and volunteers within the pandemic emergency plan prepared by residential health care facilities (Part C).
Title
Directs the office of the state long-term care ombudsman to advertise and promote the long-term care ombudsman program (Part A); directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the state long-term care ombudsman and the commissioners of the departments responsible for the license or certification of long-term care facilities, to establish policies and procedures for reporting, by staff and volunteers of the long-term care ombudsman program, issues concerning the health, safety and welfare of residents at long-term care facilities (Part B); includes access to state long-term care ombudsman program staff and volunteers within the pandemic emergency plan prepared by residential health care facilities (Part C).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Assembly | substituted by s612b |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5436b |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2021-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.26 |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.26 |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | print number 5436a |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to aging |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00612 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.121