NY A05434 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5991
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5991
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the Sandy Ground Historical Museum for the restoration or replacement of the museum building.
Title
Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the Sandy Ground Historical Museum for the restoration or replacement of the museum building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s5991 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.558 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05991 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.218