NY A05428 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s1353a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s1353a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an obligation to affirmatively further fair housing by state departments, agencies or offices administering housing laws or housing programs and by any localities receiving state funds to administer programs and activities related to housing.
Title
Relates to establishing an obligation to affirmatively further fair housing by state departments, agencies or offices administering housing laws or housing programs and by any localities receiving state funds to administer programs and activities related to housing.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s1353a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.324 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.324 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 5428a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S01353 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.77