NY A05420 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes licensed authorized organizations to conduct certain poker tournaments as licensed games of chance fundraisers.
Title
Authorizes licensed authorized organizations to conduct certain poker tournaments as licensed games of chance fundraisers.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | print number 5420a |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S00988 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES