NY A05418 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s4630b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the family and fire fighter protection act relating to the regulation of chemicals in upholstered furniture, mattresses and electronic enclosures; bans the use of certain flame retardant chemicals in furniture and mattresses; bans the use of certain flame retardant chemicals in electronic casings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the family and fire fighter protection act relating to the regulation of chemicals in upholstered furniture, mattresses and electronic enclosures; bans the use of certain flame retardant chemicals in furniture and mattresses; bans the use of certain flame retardant chemicals in electronic casings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09Assemblysubstituted by s4630b
2021-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.659
2021-06-09Assemblyreported
2021-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-27Assemblyprint number 5418b
2021-05-27Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2021-05-25Assemblyprint number 5418a
2021-05-25Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2021-05-11Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-02-16Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S04630 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A5418
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05418&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05418
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05418&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05418A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05418&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05418B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05418&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05418&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05418&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments 750

feedback