NY A05418 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To provide a new way to finance long term care in New York State that will result in greater freedom for the individual in need of services and in cost savings for the public sector.
Title
Establishes the New York state compact for long term care; provides certain tax credits; requires federal financial participation; requires that the state provide assurance of quality of services in designing the waiver; outlines participation in such compact and pledge amounts; authorizes the waiver of all or part of the participation fee and the requirement that a beneficiary pay the difference between the compact rate and the compact subsidy if the beneficiary's countable income, after deductions of these items is less than certain protected income amounts; describes fraudulent practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to aging | |
2009-06-16 | print number 5418a | |
2009-06-16 | amend (t) and recommit to aging | |
2009-02-13 | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S4064-B (Same As) 2010-02-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES