NY A05413 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9448
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9448
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an exception from registration for nonresident pharmacies in cases of a specific patient need or a declared public health emergency under certain conditions.
Title
Permits an exception from registration for nonresident pharmacies in cases of a specific patient need or a declared public health emergency under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9448 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.769 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 5413a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05489 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - referred to higher education
S09448 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.176
S09448 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.176