NY A05411 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s4620c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s4620c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health plans operating in the state to furnish the cost, benefit, and coverage data as required to the enrollee, his or her health care provider, or the third-party of his or her choosing.
Title
Requires health plans operating in the state to furnish the cost, benefit, and coverage data as required to the enrollee, his or her health care provider, or the third-party of his or her choosing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s4620c |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5411d |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5411c |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.594 |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | print number 5411b |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | print number 5411a |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04620 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.104