NY A05409 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to not-for-profits' use of certain residential dwellings for individuals who are or were homeless or at risk of homelessness.
Title
Relates to not-for-profits' use of certain residential dwellings for individuals who are or were homeless or at risk of homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03703 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A07115 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to housing
A07115 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to housing