NY A05408 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to increase the terms of office of members of the legislature to four years and limit the terms of office a member of the legislature may serve.
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to increase the terms of office of members of the legislature to four years and limit the terms of office a member of the legislature may serve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04509 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY