NY A05406 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land, the Freeport Armory, to the village of Freeport.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land, the Freeport Armory, to the village of Freeport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.618 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.86 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | substituted for a5406 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.499 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s1665 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.86 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.86 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01665 (Same As) 2019-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.618