NY A05399 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Declares a climate emergency and places a ban on fossil fuel infrastructure projects but shall not apply to repair or maintenance of existing infrastructure.
Title
Declares a climate emergency and places a ban on fossil fuel infrastructure projects but shall not apply to repair or maintenance of existing infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | print number 5399c |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | print number 5399b |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | print number 5399a |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05518 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION