NY A05398 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - print number 5398a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - print number 5398a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an electronic monitoring program for children diagnosed with an autism spectrum disorder as well as other developmental disabilities.
Title
Relates to establishing an electronic monitoring program for children diagnosed with an autism spectrum disorder as well as other developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | print number 5398a |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01629 (Same As) 2018-02-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1629A