NY A05390 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to operation of a three-wheeled vehicle.
Title
Relates to operation of a three-wheeled vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-27 | Senate | vetoed memo.59 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.882 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4580C |
2020-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5390b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.204 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.265 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.265 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 5390a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04580 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled