NY A05389 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York Health program, a comprehensive system of access to health insurance for New York state residents: provides for administrative structure of the plan; provides for powers and duties of the board of trustees, the scope of benefits, payment methodologies and care coordination; establishes the New York Health Trust Fund which would hold monies from a variety of sources to be used solely to finance the plan; enacts provisions relating to financing of New York Health, including a payroll assessment, similar to the Medicare tax; establishes a temporary commission on implementation of the plan; provides for collective negotiations by health care providers with New York Health.
Title
Establishes the New York Health program, a comprehensive system of access to health insurance for New York state residents: provides for administrative structure of the plan; provides for powers and duties of the board of trustees, the scope of benefits, payment methodologies and care coordination; establishes the New York Health Trust Fund which would hold monies from a variety of sources to be used solely to finance the plan; enacts provisions relating to financing of New York Health, including a payroll assessment, similar to the Medicare tax; establishes a temporary commission on implementation of the plan; provides for collective negotiations by health care providers with New York Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | print number 5389a |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02078 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH