NY A05379 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a policy term of less than one year where an insured requests such a policy from an insurer offering such a policy.
Title
Provides for a policy term of less than one year where an insured requests such a policy from an insurer offering such a policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | approval memo.69 |
2021-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.679 |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.480 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4326 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.183 |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04326 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5379