NY A05375 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 5375a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 5375a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of gas-powered leaf and lawn blowers between May 1st and September 30th.
Title
Prohibits the use of gas-powered leaf and lawn blowers between May 1st and September 30th.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] |
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | print number 5375a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01113 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1113A