NY A05370 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of public health to develop and disseminate information regarding bone marrow donor programs and authorizes physicians, physician assistants and nurse practitioners to provide such information to patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the department of public health to develop and disseminate information regarding bone marrow donor programs and authorizes physicians, physician assistants and nurse practitioners to provide such information to patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-21Senate3RD READING CAL.605
2020-07-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6705
2020-01-23SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2020-01-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-01-23Assemblypassed assembly
2020-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.203
2020-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.264
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.264
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-29Assemblyprint number 5370a
2019-05-29Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2019-02-11Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06705 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5370A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05370
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05370A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05370&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5370#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback